Chan, Kevin Joseph (CPSO#: 76358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 2J141
300 Prince Philip Drive
St Johns NL  A1B 3V6
Phone: (709) 777-4414
Fax: (709) 777-4446
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: (416) 860-6696
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Joseph Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chan ( CPSO# 76358 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 860-6996


Corporation Name: Drs. Chan Flanders Lalani & Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chan ( CPSO# 76358 )
Dr. D. Flanders ( CPSO# 77729 )
Dr. A. Lalani ( CPSO# 72007 )
Dr. S. Mehta ( CPSO# 71498 )

Business Address:
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 860-6696

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN JOSEPH CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2001