Chan, Kevin Tsz Kit (CPSO#: 90577)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2015 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2016