Chan, Konrad Kung Yeung (CPSO#: 67727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KONRAD KUNG YEUNG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999