Chan, Kwan-Leung (CPSO#: 32208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart
Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 6967337
Fax: (613) 6967127
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kwan Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chan ( CPSO# 32208 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room 3412
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4189

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 04 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KWAN-LEUNG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1981