Chan, Lawrence Ka Chau (CPSO#: 68016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
325 Bamburgh Circle
Scarborough ON  M1W 3Y1
Phone: (416) 492-8068
Fax: (416) 497-7796
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence K.C. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chan ( CPSO# 68016 )

Business Address:
325 Bamburgh Circle
Scarborough ON  M1W 3Y1
Phone Number: (416) 492-8068

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE KA CHAU CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996