Chan, Macky Man Ki (CPSO#: 86942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11, 2901 Markham Road
Toronto ON  M1X 0B6
Phone: (416)609-3333
Fax: (416)609-3334
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Dermatology
8E - 471, 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5721
Fax: (416) 603-2782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Macky Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chan ( CPSO# 86942 )

Business Address:
11 - 2901 Markham Road
Toronto ON  M1X 0B6
Phone Number: (416) 609-3333

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Dermatology
399 Bathurst Street
Room 8E-471
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5721

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MACKY MAN KI CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009