Chan, Matthew Isaiah (CPSO#: 99236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street E
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone: 519-291-3120
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Nunavut
Zimbabwe

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW ISAIAH CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2012