Chan, Mercedes Olivia (CPSO#: 90350)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Hong Kong, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 25 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2009 to 01 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2009