Chan, Michael Chun-Keung (CPSO#: 57190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: Chan, Chun Keung (used until: 21 Dec 1994 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 287-1943
Fax: (416) 283-4083
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Woodbine Endoscopy
100 Renfrew Dr, Suite 130
Markham ON  L3R 9R6
Canada
Phone: (905) 948-9119
Fax: (905) 948-8358
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

GTA Endoscopy
920-305 Milner Ave
Scarborough ON  M1B3V4
Canada
Phone: 416-321-3883
Fax: 416-321-5162
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

#405
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Canada
Phone: (416) 292-5666
Fax: (416) 292-6733
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHUN-KEUNG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1988