Chan, Ming-Ka (CPSO#: 69322)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jan 1999 to 31 Mar 1999
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1999