Chan, Peter Boon Kin (CPSO#: 29075)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of New South Wales, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016