Chan, Peter Wing-To (CPSO#: 26966)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Taiwan University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2004

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 May 1989
Summary:

 In May 1989, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Peter Wing-To Chan guilty of professional 
 misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to 
 maintain the standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Chan be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  It was 
 further ruled that Dr. Chan's licence to practice be suspended for a period of one year, but that 
 this suspension would itself be suspended provided that the following conditions were met:  he 
 must agree to be evaluated by the McMaster Physician Evaluation Program; he was successfully to 
 complete any course of retraining or instruction that the Program might recommend; he was to file 
 with the Registrar of the College, in a form satisfactory to the Registrar, proof that he had 
 satisfactorily completed the evaluation and any retraining or instruction recommended by the 
 Program within one year of this Order becoming final; he was to consent to the release by the 
 College to the administrators of the Program these reasons for decision together with any other 
 information concerning this case that might assist the administrators of the Program; and he was 
 to be responsible for any fees, costs or other expenses incidental to the evaluation by the 
 Program and the completion of any courses of retraining or instruction that the Program might 
 recommend.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 15 May 1989