Chan, Raymond Shiu Kwong (CPSO#: 23117)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jan 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jan 2008

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: January 3, 2008
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking, effective January 3, 2008, by Dr. Raymond Shiu Kwong Chan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
1. I, Dr. Raymond Shiu Kwong Chan, hereby resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and any other body in any jurisdiction that regulates the practice of medicine and where I am a member, effective immediately.2. I hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.3. I consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.
4. I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated May 17, 2007, for allegations respecting standard of practice for patient care. 5. I, Dr. Raymond Shiu Kwong Chan, by entering into this undertaking, do not admit any of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated May 17, 2007.