Chan, Roy Kwok-Yau (CPSO#: 30749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wardenwood Health Centre
2361 Warden Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1T 1V7
Phone: (416) 299-4999
Fax: 416 2991322
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.Y. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chan ( CPSO# 30749 )

Business Address:
2361 Warden Avenue
Toronto ON  M1T 1V7
Phone Number: (416) 299-4999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROY KWOK-YAU CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1980