Chan, Steven Man Cheong (CPSO#: 108181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Oct 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Stanford University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer
MaRS, TMDT
101 College Street, Room 8-354
Toronto ON  M5G 1L7
Phone: 6479655748
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chan ( CPSO# 108181)

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Research Tower
101 College Street
Suite 8-354
Toronto ON  M5G 1L7
Phone Number: (416) 634-7268

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Oct 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Hematology Effective: 26 Oct 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Steven  Man  Cheong  Chan  may practise medicine independently in internal
            medicine and haematology.