Chan Tai Kong, Justin Brian (CPSO#: 99540)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 113, 385 Silver Star Blvd., Scarborough, Ontario M1V 0E3
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2012 to 20 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016