Chan, Thomas Tung (CPSO#: 66518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Medical Staff Office
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8101
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 6006
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2550
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS TUNG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1995