Chan, Victoria Mai-Ying (CPSO#: 62598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
57 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1G8
Phone: (905) 780-6873
Fax: (905) 780-6894
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victoria Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chan ( CPSO# 62598 )

Business Address:
57 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1G8
Phone Number: (905) 780-6873

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA MAI-YING CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1991