Chan, Wai Lam William (CPSO#: 64992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4190 Finch Avenue East
Suite 205
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 299-9088
Fax: (416) 299-1543
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wai-Lam William Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Chan ( CPSO# 64992 )

Business Address:
205 - 4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 299-9088

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAI LAM WILLIAM CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993