Chan, Wilson Wai-Shun (CPSO#: 93706)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Jun 2010 to 25 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2010 to 22 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2010