Chan, Wing Chow (CPSO#: 25536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Apr 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rosedale Medical Centre
600 Sherbourne Street
Suite 601
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 960-5007
Fax: (416) 960-0333
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 08 Apr 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WING CHOW CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1973