Chan, Yu-Jan (CPSO#: 61667)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Kaohsiung Medical College, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 18 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2001