Chand, Pankaj Pappu (CPSO#: 65048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 40054
Waterloo Town Square
75 King Street South
Waterloo ON  N2J 4V1
Phone: (800) 785-1519
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pankaj Chand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chand ( CPSO# 65048 )

Business Address:
Waterloo Town Square
75 King Street South
PO Box 40054
Waterloo ON  N2J 4V1
Phone Number: (519) 748-8182

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PANKAJ PAPPU CHAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1992

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 16, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)