Chanda, Melanie Nicole (CPSO#: 69952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
304 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone: (613) 967-9900
Fax: (613) 967-4882
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chanda and Kovacs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chanda ( CPSO# 69952 )
Dr. D. Kovacs ( CPSO# 71228 )

Business Address:
304 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 967-9900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE NICOLE CHANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Urogynaecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Urogynaecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001