Chander, Sanjeev (CPSO#: 66566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Cardiovascular Center
502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjeev Chander Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chander ( CPSO# 66566 )

Business Address:
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
Ottawa Cardiovascular Center
502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 738-1584

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJEEV CHANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 May 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1999