Chandna, Divi (CPSO#: 66820)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002