Chandonnet, Martin (CPSO#: 87171)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009