Chandra, Sujata (CPSO#: 68036)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 04 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 1997 to 01 Aug 1997
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 1997