Chandran, Indira (CPSO#: 62938)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Indira Chandran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 16 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage Retrieval Services 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 or (888) 563-3732
Date Received: 18 Dec 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015