Chandrasekaran, Akila Priyadarsini (CPSO#: 66710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Smart
Suite 12
2425 Eglington Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1K 5G8
Phone: (416)757-7117
Fax: (416) 757-7376
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AKILA PRIYADARSINI CHANDRASEKARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRASEKARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1995