Chandrasena, Ranjith Dayananda (CPSO#: 42434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Ceylon, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
M H A P
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B7
Phone: (519) 351-6144 Ext. 5744
Fax: (519) 351-0450
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Woodstock General
270 Riddell Street
Woodstock ON  N4A 6N6
Canada
Phone: (579) 421-4223
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ranjith Chandrasena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chandrasena ( CPSO# 42434 )

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
PO Box 2030
Chatham ON  N7L 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 351-6144

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANJITH DAYANANDA CHANDRASENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRASENA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1985