Chandurkar, Vikram (CPSO#: 100001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Grant Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie st
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: 416-551-4438
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre for Complex Diabetes Care
Branson Ambulatory Care Centre
North York General Hospital
555 Finch Avenue West, North York
North York ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
Phone: 416-635-2575
Fax: 416-635-2601
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York Medical Arts
1333 Sheppard Ave East, Suite 306
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: 416-551-3916
Fax: 416-551-4438
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikram Chandurkar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chandurkar ( CPSO# 100001)

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
Suite 315
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 551-3916

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 635-2575

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKRAM CHANDURKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDURKAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2013