Chang, David Hon-Sen (CPSO#: 78094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6212
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

199 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Canada
Phone: 4169616044
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chang ( CPSO# 78094 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID HON-SEN CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007