Chang, Hong (CPSO#: 66973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Jianxi Medical College, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Lab Hematology
Toronto General Hospital
11E 413
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4858
Fax: (416) 340-5543
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 04 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HONG CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 May 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1998