Chang, Jacqueline (CPSO#: 64680)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Nov 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010