Chang, Jose (CPSO#: 56738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3625
Fax: (905) 721-6103
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jose Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chang ( CPSO# 56738 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSE CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1987