Chang, Karen Delysia (CPSO#: 50385)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7103
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen D. Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chang ( CPSO# 50385 )

Business Address:
Centenary Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN DELYSIA CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1987