Chang, Michael Byong-Uk (CPSO#: 70184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 283-0100
Fax: (416) 283-9915
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: M B Chang Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 70184 )

Business Address:
300 - 1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 283-0100

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Scarborough Grace
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital General Site
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 428-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL BYONG-UK CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2001