Chang, Susan Marina (CPSO#: 58700)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 1999