Chang, Tom Shio-Min (CPSO#: 59536)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2000