Chang, Yean-Lu (CPSO#: 60411)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 May 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Taiwan University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 May 1989