Channan, Gitanjli (CPSO#: 66840)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 18 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: Khanna, Gitanjli (used until: 07 Mar 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Dec 1997