Chao, Stephen (CPSO#: 69988)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 155
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 256-8338
Fax: (519) 258-7337
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Chao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chao ( CPSO# 69988 )

Business Address:
155 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 256-8338

Business Address:
150 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 255-7964

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN CHAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2001