Chaparro Gomez, Luis Enrique (CPSO#: 87342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Antioquia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
150 College Street
Room 121 Fitzgerald Building
Toronto ON  M5S 3E2
Phone: (416) 946-0608
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUIS ENRIQUE CHAPARRO GOMEZ shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHAPARRO GOMEZ is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. CHAPARRO GOMEZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHAPARRO GOMEZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHAPARRO GOMEZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHAPARRO GOMEZ is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHAPARRO GOMEZ no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 17 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 17 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2010 to 19 Nov 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 20 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019