Chaparro Mutis, Blanca Cecilia (CPSO#: 68585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jan 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Juan N. Corpas, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Respirology
585 University Avenue
11 PMB 11 - Room 132
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4996
Fax: (416) 340-3609
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 6 - 040
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5409
Fax: (416) 864-5651
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaparro Mutis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gutierrez ( CPSO# 73272 )
Dr. B. Chaparro Mutis ( CPSO# 68585 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
PMB 11 -132
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4996

Business Address:
Suite 6 - 040
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 05 Jan 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Blanca Cecilia Chaparro Mutis may practise medicine independently in
            respirology, only.