Chapman, Bryanne Lynn (CPSO#: 59796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 570-1655
Fax: (519) 570-3477
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Maurice Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maurice ( CPSO# 64020 )
Dr. B. Chapman ( CPSO# 59796 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
749 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E4
Phone Number: (519) 884-0180

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYANNE LYNN CHAPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAPMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1989