Chapnik, Victor Houston (CPSO#: 70575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1998

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview North Medical Centre
Unit 6
446 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 7Z9
Phone: (905) 751-1642
Fax: (905) 751-0385
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victor Chapnik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chapnik ( CPSO# 70575 )

Business Address:
Bayview North Medical Centre
Suite 6
446 Hollandview Trail
Aurora ON  L4G 7Z9
Phone Number: (905) 751-1642

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR HOUSTON CHAPNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAPNIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1998

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 9, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)