Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Charania, Hanif (CPSO#: 62420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
900 Greenbank Road
Nepean ON  K2J 1S8
Phone: (613) 825-8476
Fax: (613) 825-9045
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Charania Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Charania ( CPSO# 62420 )

Business Address:
Suite 107
900 Greenbank Road
Nepean ON  K2J 1S8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANIF CHARANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARANIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1991