Charania, Sahira H (CPSO#: 59526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
900 Greenbank Road
Nepean ON  K2J 1S8
Phone: (613) 825-8476
Fax: (613) 825-9045
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charania & Dhalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Dhalla ( CPSO# 54148 )
Dr. S. Charania ( CPSO# 59526 )

Business Address:
107 - 900 Greenbank Road
Nepean ON  K2J 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 825-8476

Business Address:
301 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 225-2131

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAHIRA H CHARANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARANIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989