Charbonneau, Fabien Andre (CPSO#: 58388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8754 First Line
Campbellville ON  L0P 1B0
Phone: (905) 854-3963
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fabien Charbonneau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Charbonneau ( CPSO# 58388 )

Business Address:
8754 First Line
Campbellville ON  L0P 1B0
Phone Number: (905) 854-3963

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H8
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FABIEN ANDRE CHARBONNEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARBONNEAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1988